Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/20/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/21/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/21/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/21/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/21/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/21/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/21/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/21/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/21/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/22/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/22/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/22/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/22/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/22/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/22/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/22/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/22/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/22/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/22/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/22/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/22/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/22/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/26/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/26/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/11/2007