Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/28/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/17/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/17/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/18/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/18/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/18/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/18/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/18/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/18/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/19/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/19/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/24/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/27/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/01/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 08/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/04/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/04/2007