Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/27/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/11/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/11/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/17/2007