Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/11/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/11/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/11/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/11/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/16/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/16/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/16/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/22/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/22/2007