Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/19/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/10/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/20/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/08/2007