Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/12/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/17/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/05/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/05/2007