Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/11/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/11/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/27/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/27/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/27/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/01/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/02/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/06/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/06/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/11/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/11/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/12/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/13/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/13/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/13/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/13/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/19/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/19/2007