Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/25/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/07/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/24/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/24/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/25/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/25/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/02/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 10/02/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/02/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/02/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/02/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/02/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/02/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/03/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/03/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/09/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 10/15/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/16/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 10/16/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/16/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/18/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/07/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/08/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/08/2007