Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/25/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/25/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/25/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/25/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/14/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/14/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/14/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/14/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/14/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/17/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/18/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/18/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/02/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/02/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/03/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/04/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/04/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/04/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/09/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/23/2007