Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/26/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/30/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/30/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/31/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/31/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/31/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/31/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/02/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/04/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/04/2007