Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/26/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/31/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/14/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/19/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/25/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/01/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/03/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/09/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/04/2007