Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 07/30/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/30/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/31/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/26/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/04/2007