Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/31/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/31/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/31/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/02/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 08/04/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/17/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/17/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/19/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/19/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/24/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/25/2007