Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 08/01/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/29/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 11/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/23/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/10/2008