Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/04/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/06/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/06/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/06/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/06/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/06/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/06/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/06/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/06/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/06/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/06/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/06/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/06/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/06/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/06/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/06/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/07/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/07/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/07/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/07/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/07/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/14/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/14/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/14/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/14/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/14/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/14/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/14/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/14/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/14/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/14/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/14/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/14/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/14/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/14/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/17/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/17/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/20/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/20/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/20/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/20/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/20/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/20/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/20/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/24/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/24/2007