Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/03/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/19/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/10/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/07/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/24/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew