Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/04/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/05/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/25/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/02/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/04/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/09/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/09/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/15/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/16/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/16/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/16/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/17/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/17/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/17/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/23/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/23/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/18/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/19/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew