Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/04/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/18/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/18/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/18/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/24/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/24/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/24/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/24/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/26/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/01/2007