Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 09/05/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 09/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/05/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/05/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/18/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/20/2007