Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/10/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/10/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/10/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/10/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/10/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/10/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 09/10/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/10/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/10/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/10/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/10/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/10/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/10/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/10/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/10/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/10/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/10/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/10/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/10/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/10/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/10/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/10/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/10/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/10/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/10/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/17/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/17/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/25/2007