Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 09/10/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/10/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/19/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/19/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/19/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/19/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/15/2008