Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/15/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/15/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/15/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/15/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/15/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/15/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/15/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/16/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/17/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/17/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 07/22/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/22/2008