Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/19/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/25/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/22/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/16/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/08/2008