Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/02/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/13/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/13/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/13/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/13/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/13/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/13/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/18/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/09/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/22/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/30/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/08/2008