Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/02/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/02/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/02/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/23/2007