Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/26/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/26/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/27/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/03/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/11/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/12/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/14/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/14/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/17/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/24/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/24/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/09/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/09/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/09/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/11/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/11/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/11/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/15/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/15/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/15/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/17/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/17/2008