Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/25/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/25/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/25/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 09/25/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 09/25/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/25/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/25/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/26/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/26/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/26/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/26/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/01/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/01/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/01/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 10/01/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/10/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/10/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/16/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/16/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 10/16/2007