Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 09/26/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/26/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/26/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/26/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 09/26/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/26/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/26/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/26/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/03/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/10/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/10/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/10/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/10/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/10/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/15/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/17/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/17/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/17/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/17/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/17/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/18/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/18/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/18/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 10/18/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/18/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 10/18/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/22/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/22/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/23/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/09/2007