Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/10/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/06/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/06/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/06/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/06/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/06/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/06/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 11/06/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/07/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/07/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/07/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 11/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/07/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/07/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/07/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/07/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/09/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/09/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/06/2008