Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/24/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/24/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/24/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/24/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/24/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/24/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/24/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/24/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/25/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/25/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/29/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/29/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/29/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/29/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/30/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/30/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/30/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 10/30/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/30/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/30/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/30/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/30/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/30/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/30/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/30/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 10/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/31/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/31/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 11/05/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/05/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/05/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/07/2007
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/08/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/04/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/10/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/11/2007