Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/02/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/04/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/04/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/04/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/04/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/09/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/09/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/15/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/22/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/05/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/08/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/08/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/08/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/08/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/08/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/13/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/04/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/05/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/11/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/11/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/11/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/11/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/13/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/13/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/13/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 01/22/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/22/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/12/2008