Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/31/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/31/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/15/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/15/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/02/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/25/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/14/2007