Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/10/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/10/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/15/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/16/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/25/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/25/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/07/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/07/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 11/08/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/13/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/13/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/18/2007