Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/12/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/15/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/15/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/15/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/15/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/16/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/16/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/16/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/16/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/16/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/16/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/16/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/16/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/16/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/18/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/18/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/18/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/18/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/18/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/18/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/01/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/01/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/01/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/05/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/05/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/04/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/04/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/17/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/17/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/17/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/17/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/07/2008