Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/16/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/18/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/11/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/11/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/13/2007