Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/05/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/19/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/08/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/22/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/17/2008