Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/01/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/01/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/01/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/08/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/08/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/13/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 12/13/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/13/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/22/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/29/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 04/02/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/09/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/09/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/09/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/14/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/05/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/25/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/22/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/22/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/29/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 08/01/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/15/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/22/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/22/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/22/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/22/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/22/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/23/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/23/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/23/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/25/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/25/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/25/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/26/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/26/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/28/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/28/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/02/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/02/2008