Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/22/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/22/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/22/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/22/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/22/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/22/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/22/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/22/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/22/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/22/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/22/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/24/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/24/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/29/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/29/2007