Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 10/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/23/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/23/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/23/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/23/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/23/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/23/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/23/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/23/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/23/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/23/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/23/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/23/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/23/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/23/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/23/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/23/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/23/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/23/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/23/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/23/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/24/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/24/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 10/24/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/24/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/24/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/25/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/25/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/25/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/25/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/25/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/25/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/25/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/25/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/29/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/29/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/30/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/06/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 11/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/13/2007