Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/31/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 10/31/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/31/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/31/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/31/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/31/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/31/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/31/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 11/01/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/01/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/01/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/01/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 11/01/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/01/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/01/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/01/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/01/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/01/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 11/01/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/01/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/01/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/01/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/06/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/06/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/06/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 11/07/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/09/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/18/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/06/2008