Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/30/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 10/30/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/31/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/31/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/31/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/31/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/31/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/01/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/01/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/01/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/01/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/05/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/05/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/05/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/15/2007