There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the establishment of Hunters for the Hungry programs across the United States and the contributions of those programs efforts to decrease hunger and help feed those in need.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/24/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10720)
09/24/2007Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 110-343.
01/19/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
09/24/2007-3:52pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/24/2007-3:52pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10720)
09/24/2007-3:44pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 79.
09/24/2007-3:44pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10720-10721)
09/24/2007-3:43pmMr. Cardoza moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
09/24/2007Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 119.
09/24/2007Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 110-343.
02/06/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
01/19/2007Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
01/19/2007Introduced in House

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 01/24/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/29/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/29/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/30/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/05/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/05/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/14/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/27/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/18/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/24/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture01/19/2007 Referred to
09/24/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-343
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry02/06/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.79.


Subjects (19)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.79. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/24/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes: (1) the cooperative efforts of hunters, sportsmen's associations, meat processors, state meat inspectors, and hunger relief organizations to establish Hunters for the Hungry programs across the United States; and (2) the contributions of Hunters for the Hungry programs to efforts to decrease hunger and help feed those in need.