Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 01/24/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/29/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/29/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/30/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/05/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/05/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/14/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/27/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/18/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/24/2007