Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/05/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/05/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 11/05/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 11/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/06/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/07/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/14/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/22/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/28/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/28/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/28/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/03/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/03/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/03/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/05/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/11/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/04/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/06/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/08/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/03/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/11/2008