Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/04/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/19/2007