Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 11/09/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/13/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/13/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/13/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/13/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/13/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 11/14/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/14/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/14/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 11/14/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 11/14/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/14/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/14/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/04/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/04/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 12/06/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/06/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/06/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/11/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/11/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/12/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/12/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/12/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/12/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/18/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/23/2008