There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Welcoming His Holiness Pope Benedict XVI on his first apostolic visit to the United States.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/09/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2076)
12/04/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
04/09/2008-10:42amMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/09/2008-10:42amOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2076)
04/09/2008-10:26amDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 838.
04/09/2008-10:26amConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2076-2078)
04/09/2008-10:26amMr. Payne moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
12/04/2007Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
12/04/2007Introduced in House

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/11/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 12/11/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/12/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/12/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/12/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/12/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/18/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/18/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/22/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/22/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 01/22/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/22/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/07/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/27/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/27/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/27/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/27/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/05/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/05/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/05/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/05/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/05/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/11/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/11/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/02/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/08/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/08/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/08/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/08/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs12/04/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.838. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/09/2008)

Welcomes His Holiness Pope Benedict XVI on his first apostolic visit to the United States.