Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/11/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 12/11/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/12/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/12/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/12/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/12/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/18/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/18/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/22/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/22/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 01/22/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/22/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/07/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/27/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/27/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/27/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/27/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/05/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/05/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/05/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/05/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/05/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/11/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/11/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/02/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/02/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/08/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/08/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/08/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/08/2008