Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 12/04/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 12/04/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 12/05/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 12/05/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/05/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/05/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/05/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/05/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/06/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/06/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 12/06/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/06/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/06/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/06/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/06/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/06/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/06/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/06/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 12/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 12/06/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/06/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/06/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/06/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 12/06/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 12/06/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/06/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 12/06/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/06/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 12/06/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/06/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 12/06/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/06/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/06/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 12/06/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/10/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/10/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/10/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/10/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/10/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/10/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/10/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/12/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/12/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/17/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/17/2007