There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Expressing gratitude to all of the member states of the International Commission of the International Tracing Service on ratifying the May 2006 Agreement to amend the 1955 Bonn Accords granting access to vast Holocaust and other World War II related archives located in Bad Arolsen, Germany.

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing gratitude to all of the member states of the International Commission of the International Tracing Service (ITS) on ratifying the May 2006 Agreement to amend the 1955 Bonn Accords granting open access to vast Holocaust and other World War II related archives located in Bad Arolsen, Germany.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/11/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1459)
12/10/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
03/11/2008-2:17pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/11/2008-2:17pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1459)
03/11/2008-1:57pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 854.
03/11/2008-1:57pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1459-1462)
03/11/2008-1:56pmMr. Crowley moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
02/27/2008Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,.
02/27/2008Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
12/10/2007Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
12/10/2007Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2528)
12/10/2007Introduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 12/10/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 12/10/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 12/10/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/13/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/13/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/13/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/13/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/18/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/18/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/18/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/19/2007
Del. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/19/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/19/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/15/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/16/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/22/2008
Resident Commissioner Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/06/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/27/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs12/10/2007 Referred to
02/27/2008 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.854. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/11/2008)

Expresses the appreciation of the House of Representatives to all countries that worked to ratify the amendments to the Bonn Accords to allow for open access to the Holocaust Archives located in Bad Arolsen, Germany.

Congratulates the efforts of the United States Holocaust Memorial Museum, the Department of State, and the International Committee of the Red Cross to open the archives.

Encourages the United States Holocaust Memorial Museum and the International Committee of the Red Cross to act with urgency to ensure that survivors, their families, and researchers have access to, and assistance in using, the archives.

Remembers the murder of six million innocent Jews and of more than five million other innocent victims committed by the Nazis and their collaborators.

States that the House of Representatives must remain vigilant in combating global anti-Semitism, intolerance, and bigotry.